NH SB317 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Sen. Hennessey Moved Laid on Table, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted; 03/14/2019; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibiting sanctuary jurisdictions in New Hampshire.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibiting sanctuary jurisdictions in New Hampshire.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-14 - Senate - Laid on Table (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-14SenateSen. Hennessey Moved Laid on Table, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted; 03/14/2019; Senate Journal 8
2019-03-14SenatePending Motion Committee Amendment # 2019-0794s; 03/14/2019; Senate Journal 8
2019-03-05SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0794s, 03/14/2019; Senate Calendar 13
2019-02-20Senate==RECONVENE== Hearing: 03/04/2019, Room 103, State House, 02:00 pm; Senate Calendar 12
2019-01-31Senate==RECESSED== Hearing: 02/07/2019, Room 100, State House, 10:40 am; Senate Calendar 9
2019-01-29SenateIntroduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback