NH SB311 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Division III Work Session: 04/23/2024 02:30 pm Legislative Office Building 210-211
Pending: House Finance Committee
Hearing: May 7 @ 10:00 am in Legislative Office Building 212
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Division III Work Session: 04/23/2024 02:30 pm Legislative Office Building 210-211
Pending: House Finance Committee
Hearing: May 7 @ 10:00 am in Legislative Office Building 212
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to property tax offset for the town of Hampstead and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Relative to property tax offset for the town of Hampstead and making an appropriation therefor.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | House | Division III Work Session: 04/23/2024 02:30 pm Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2024-04-18 | House | Division III Work Session: 04/29/2024 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2024-04-17 | House | ==CANCELLED== Division I Work Session: 05/07/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 212 |
2024-04-11 | House | Public Hearing: 04/17/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2024-02-29 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 02/22/2024 and referred to Finance House Journal 6 |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 01/18/2024; Senate Journal 2 |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 01/18/2024, Vote 7-0; Senate Calendar 3 |
2023-12-14 | Senate | Hearing: 01/09/2024, Room 103, State House, 01:20 pm; Senate Calendar 48 |
2023-12-08 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/03/2024 and Referred to Finance; Senate Journal 1 |