NH SB311 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-04 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/04/2022 House Journal 11
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-04 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/04/2022 House Journal 11
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to access to drivers' license information for healthcare and motor vehicle related business purposes.
Title
Relative to access to drivers' license information for healthcare and motor vehicle related business purposes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-04 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/04/2022 House Journal 11 |
2022-04-27 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) |
2022-04-20 | House | Executive Session: 04/26/2022 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 201-203 |
2022-04-06 | House | Public Hearing: 04/12/2022 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 201-203 |
2022-03-23 | House | Introduced 03/17/2022 and referred to Transportation |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2022-1068s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/17/2022; Senate Journal 5 |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2022-1068s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/17/2022; Senate Journal 5 |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-1068s, 03/17/2022; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 11 |
2022-01-06 | Senate | Hearing: 01/25/2022, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 01:00 pm; Senate Calendar 2 |
2021-12-14 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/05/2022 and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 1 |