NH SB311 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-04 - Signed by the Governor on 05/30/2018; Chapter 0120; Effective 05/30/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-04 - Signed by the Governor on 05/30/2018; Chapter 0120; Effective 05/30/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifying rules of construction under the New Hampshire Trust Code.
Title
Clarifying rules of construction under the New Hampshire Trust Code.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-04 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 05/30/2018; Chapter 0120; Effective 05/30/2018 |
2018-05-09 | House | Enrolled 05/03/2018 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/03/2018); Senate Journal 17 |
2018-04-26 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted DV 188-134 04/26/2018 |
2018-04-18 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2018-04-18 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 04/26/2018 (Vote 11-6; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 9 |
2018-04-03 | House | Executive Session: 04/10/2018 01:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2018-03-28 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 04/03/2018 01:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2018-03-20 | House | Public Hearing: 03/28/2018 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2018-03-12 | House | Introduced 03/07/2018 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 7 P. 50 |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/15/2018; Senate Journal 4 |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/15/2018; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar Senate Calendar 7 |
2017-12-13 | Senate | Hearing: 01/09/2018, Room 100, State House, 01:00 pm; Senate Calendar 48 |
2017-12-08 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 1 |