NH SB311 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-24 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/24/2016; Senate Journal 10
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-24 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/24/2016; Senate Journal 10
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to standards for radon in water.
Title
Relative to standards for radon in water.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-24 | Senate | Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/24/2016; Senate Journal 10 |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 03/24/2016; Senate Calendar 11 |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Hearing: 03/02/2016, Room 100, State House, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 7 |
2015-12-29 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/06/2016 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 1 |