NH SB311 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-23 - Signed by the Governor on 07/21/2014; Chapter 0246; Effective 09/19/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-23 - Signed by the Governor on 07/21/2014; Chapter 0246; Effective 09/19/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing the executive director of the fish and game department to execute an agreement allowing reciprocal snowmobile riding privileges with the states of Vermont and Maine
Title
Authorizing the executive director of the fish and game department to execute an agreement allowing reciprocal snowmobile riding privileges with the states of Vermont and Maine
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-23 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 07/21/2014; Chapter 0246; Effective 09/19/2014 |
2014-06-17 | House | Enrolled (In recess of 6/4/2014) |
2014-06-04 | Senate | Enrolled |
2014-06-04 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2014-1959e Adopted |
2014-05-29 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment #1959eba Adopted, Voice Vote (In recess from 4/16/14) |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Sen. Rausch Concurs with House Amendments 1271h New Title and 1578h New Title, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 14 |
2014-05-07 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #1578h, New Title, Motion Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-05-07 | House | Amendment #2014-1578h (NT) Amendment Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-05-01 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-1578h New Title,(Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 34 |
2014-04-23 | House | Executive Session: 4/29/2014 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 202 |
2014-04-16 | House | Public Hearing: 4/22/2014 2:45 PM Legislative Office Building 202 |
2014-04-16 | House | Referred to Ways and Means |
2014-04-16 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #1271h (NT) Motion Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-04-16 | House | Amendment #2014-1271h, New Title, Amendment Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-04-10 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-1271h, New Title,(Vote 10-0; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 27 |
2014-04-02 | House | Executive Session: 4/8/14 11:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 104 |
2014-03-19 | House | Public Hearing: 4/1/2014 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 307 |
2014-03-13 | House | Introduced and Referred to Fish and Game and Marine Resources |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0162s, New Title, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Committee Amendment 0162s, New Title, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-0162s, New Title, 1/30/14; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 4 |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Hearing: 1/21/14, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 1:45 p.m.; Senate Calendar 3 |
2013-12-17 | Senate | Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Transportation |