NH SB311 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-18 - Senate Signed by the Governor on 06/18/2012; Chapter 0238; Effective 06/18/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-18 - Senate Signed by the Governor on 06/18/2012; Chapter 0238; Effective 06/18/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to weights and measures.
Title
Relative to weights and measures.
Sponsors
Rep. David Bettencourt [R] | Sen. Sharon Carson [R] | Sen. Fenton Groen [R] | Rep. Carol McGuire [R] |
Sen. Raymond White [R] | Rep. Steven Winter [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-28 - Senate - Ought to Pass with Amendment (Y: 16 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-18 | Senate Signed by the Governor on 06/18/2012; Chapter 0238; Effective 06/18/2012 | |
2012-06-06 | Senate Enrolled | |
2012-06-06 | House Enrolled | |
2012-06-06 | Senate Enrolled Bill Amendment #2012-2482e Adopted | |
2012-06-06 | House Enrolled Bill Amendment #2482e Adopted; House Journal 51, PG.2609 | |
2012-05-23 | Senate Sen. Carson Concurs with House Amendment #1703h, #2146h; Motion Adopted, Voice Vote | |
2012-05-15 | House Ought to Pass with Amendment #2146h(NT): Motion Adopted Division Vote 204-106; House Journal 43, PG.2331-2333 | |
2012-05-15 | House Amendment #2146h(NT): Amendment Adopted Division Vote 195-111; House Journal 43, PG.2331-2333 | |
2012-05-08 | House Proposed Committee Amendment #2012-2146h (New Title); House Calendar 37, PG.2091-2093 | |
2012-05-08 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2146h(NT) for May 15 (Vote 9-3; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 37, PG.2041-2042 | |
2012-05-01 | House Executive Session: 5/8/2012 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306 | |
2012-04-27 | House Full Committee Work Session: 5/2/2012 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 306 | |
2012-04-25 | House Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; House Journal 38, PG.2184-2186 | |
2012-04-25 | House Ought to Pass with Amendment #1703h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 38, PG.2184-2186 | |
2012-04-25 | House Amendment #1703h Adopted, Division Vote 260-60; House Journal 38, PG.2184-2186 | |
2012-04-25 | House Removed from Consent Calendar (Rep Bettencourt); House Journal 38, PG.2184-2186 | |
2012-04-18 | House Proposed Committee Amendment #2012-1703h; House Calendar 33, PG.1953-1954 | |
2012-04-18 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #1703h for April 25 (Vote 13-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 33, PG.1917 | |
2012-04-03 | House Executive Session: 4/17/2012 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 303 | |
2012-04-03 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 4/12/2012 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 307 | |
2012-04-03 | House Public Hearing: 4/10/2012 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 303 | |
2012-03-29 | House Introduced and Referred to Environment and Agriculture; House Journal 32, PG. 1914 | |
2012-03-28 | Senate Ought to Pass with Amendment 1484s, New Title, Regular Calendar 16Y-8N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 8, Pg.327 | |
2012-03-28 | Senate Sen. Carson Floor Amendment #2012-1484s, New Title, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 8, Pg.294 | |
2012-03-28 | Senate Committee Amendment 1412s, New Title; Division 10Y-14N, Amendment Failed; Senate Journal 8, Pg.292 | |
2012-03-28 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2012-1412s, New Title, 3/28/12 | |
2012-03-28 | Senate Special Order to the afternoon session, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; Senate Journal 8, Pg.262 | |
2012-03-22 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2012-1412s, New Title, 3/28/12; Senate Calendar 12 | |
2012-03-21 | Senate Ought to Pass with Amendment 1266s, New Title, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-3 | |
2012-03-21 | Senate Committee Amendment 1266s, New Title, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 7, Pg. 231 | |
2012-03-15 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2012-1266s, New Title, 3/21/12; Senate Calendar 11 | |
2012-02-16 | Senate Hearing: 2/24/12, Room 210-211, Legislative Office Building, 1:00 p.m.; Senate Calendar 8 | |
2012-01-01 | Senate Introduced 1/4/2012 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 1, Pg.10 |