NH SB307 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 26 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-26 - Senate Signed by the Governor on 05/26/2010; Effective 07/25/2010; Chapter 0105
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 26 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-26 - Senate Signed by the Governor on 05/26/2010; Effective 07/25/2010; Chapter 0105
Summary
Relative to voting by members of voluntary corporations and associations.
Title
Relative to voting by members of voluntary corporations and associations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-26 | Senate Signed by the Governor on 05/26/2010; Effective 07/25/2010; Chapter 0105 | |
2010-05-05 | Senate Enrolled | |
2010-05-05 | House Enrolled; House Journal 38, PG.1914 | |
2010-04-21 | House Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 35, PG.1654 | |
2010-04-14 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass for April 21 (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 31, PG.1524 | |
2010-03-24 | House Executive Session: 4/13/2010 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2010-03-10 | House Public Hearing: 3/23/2010 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2010-03-10 | House Vacated from Executive Depts & Admin and Referred to Commerce & Consumer Affairs; House Journal 23, PG.1254 | |
2010-02-17 | House Introduced and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; House Journal 18, PG.1016 | |
2010-01-27 | Senate Passed By Third Reading Resolution; Senate Journal 4, Pg.56 | |
2010-01-27 | Senate Ought to Pass, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 4, Pg.48 | |
2010-01-20 | Senate Committee Report; Ought to Pass 1/27/10; Senate Calendar 4 | |
2010-01-14 | Senate Hearing; January 19, 2010, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 2:00 p.m.; Senate Calendar 3 | |
2010-01-06 | Senate Introduced 1/6/2010 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration Committee; Senate Journal 1, Pg.4 |
New Hampshire State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/bill_status.aspx?lsr=2729&sy=2010&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2010&q=1 |