NH SB305 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB305
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-13 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/13/2020; Senate Journal 4
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-13 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/13/2020; Senate Journal 4
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the establishment of an election information portal.
Title
Relative to the establishment of an election information portal.
Sponsors
Sen. James Gray [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-13 | Senate | Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/13/2020; Senate Journal 4 |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 02/13/2020; Senate Calendar 6 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-2890s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 01/08/2020; Senate Journal 1 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2019-2890s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 01/08/2020; Senate Journal 1 |
2019-12-09 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2890s, 01/08/2020; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 47 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/14/2019; Senate Journal 8 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 03/14/2019; Senate Calendar 13 |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Hearing: 02/06/2019, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 10:00 am; Senate Calendar 9 |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Introduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 4 |
Same As/Similar To
SB305 (Carry Over) 2019-12-09 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2890s; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar