NH SB303 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass 04/15/2024 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass 04/15/2024 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the use of renewable energy funds by the department of energy.
Title
Relative to the use of renewable energy funds by the department of energy.
Sponsors
Sen. Kevin Avard [R] | Sen. David Watters [D] | Sen. Howard Pearl [R] | Sen. Sharon Carson [R] |
Rep. Michael Vose [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass 04/15/2024 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) |
2024-04-05 | House | Executive Session: 04/15/2024 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2024-03-20 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 03/25/2024 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2024-03-13 | House | Public Hearing: 03/19/2024 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2024-02-29 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 02/22/2024 and referred to Science, Technology and Energy House Journal 6 |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-0554s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/15/2024; Senate Journal 4 |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2024-0554s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/15/2024; Senate Journal 4 |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-0554s, 02/15/2024, Vote 4-0; Senate Calendar 7 |
2023-12-21 | Senate | Hearing: 01/04/2024, Room 103, State House, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 49 |
2023-12-06 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/03/2024 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 1 |