NH SB30 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Passed on June 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-08 - Signed by the Governor on 06/07/2023; Chapter 0065; Effective 08/06/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Passed on June 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-08 - Signed by the Governor on 06/07/2023; Chapter 0065; Effective 08/06/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to membership of the New Hampshire council on developmental disabilities.
Title
Relative to membership of the New Hampshire council on developmental disabilities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-08 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/07/2023; Chapter 0065; Effective 08/06/2023 |
2023-05-31 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 05/18/2023); Senate Journal 16 |
2023-05-31 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 04/18/2023 |
2023-05-04 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/04/2023 House Journal 13 P. 14 |
2023-04-26 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass 04/19/2023 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) |
2023-04-12 | House | Executive Session: 04/19/2023 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 201-203 |
2023-03-23 | House | Public Hearing: 03/29/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 201-203 |
2023-03-20 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 03/16/2023 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 01/26/2023; Senate Journal 5 |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 01/26/2023; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 7 |
2023-01-11 | Senate | Hearing: 01/18/2023, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 10:00 am; Senate Calendar 6 |
2023-01-05 | Senate | Introduced 01/05/2023 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 4 |