NH SB285 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-22 - Signed by the Governor on 06/17/2022; Chapter 0214; Effective 08/16/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-22 - Signed by the Governor on 06/17/2022; Chapter 0214; Effective 08/16/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to discount medical plan organizations.
Title
Relative to discount medical plan organizations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-22 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/17/2022; Chapter 0214; Effective 08/16/2022 |
2022-06-07 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 05/26/2022 House Journal 14 |
2022-06-06 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 05/26/2022); Senate Journal 13 |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/12/2022; Senate Journal 12 |
2022-05-04 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1376h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/04/2022 House Journal 11 |
2022-05-04 | House | Amendment # 1376h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/04/2022 House Journal 11 |
2022-04-22 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-1376h (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) |
2022-04-14 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 04/20/2022 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2022-04-13 | House | Executive Session: 04/20/2022 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2022-03-30 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 04/07/2022 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2022-03-30 | House | Public Hearing: 04/06/2022 01:15 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2022-03-23 | House | Introduced 03/17/2022 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2022-0636s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/16/2022; Senate Journal 3 |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2022-0636s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/16/2022; Senate Journal 3 |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-0636s, 02/16/2022; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 7 |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Hearing: 02/09/2022, Room 100, State House, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 4 |
2021-12-14 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/05/2022 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 1 |