NH SB272 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-18 - Indefinitely Postpone (Rep. Wilhelm): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 195-190 05/18/2023 House Journal 14 P. 16
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-18 - Indefinitely Postpone (Rep. Wilhelm): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 195-190 05/18/2023 House Journal 14 P. 16
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a parents' bill of rights in education.
Title
Establishing a parents' bill of rights in education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-18 - House - Indefinitely Postpone (Y: 195 N: 190 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - House - Table (Y: 186 N: 199 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2023-05-18 - House - Adopt Floor Amendment (Y: 198 N: 187 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - House - Adopt Floor Amendment (Y: 198 N: 187 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - House - Reconsider (Y: 184 N: 201 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2023-05-18 - House - Adopt Floor Amendment (Y: 201 N: 184 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - House - Adopt Floor Amendment (Y: 198 N: 187 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - House - Adopt Floor Amendment (Y: 196 N: 189 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - House - Adopt Floor Amendment (Y: 196 N: 188 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - House - Table (Y: 186 N: 199 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2023-05-18 - House - Adopt Floor Amendment (Y: 198 N: 187 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - House - Adopt Floor Amendment (Y: 198 N: 187 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - House - Reconsider (Y: 184 N: 201 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2023-05-18 - House - Adopt Floor Amendment (Y: 201 N: 184 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - House - Adopt Floor Amendment (Y: 198 N: 187 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - House - Adopt Floor Amendment (Y: 196 N: 189 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - House - Adopt Floor Amendment (Y: 196 N: 188 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-18 | House | Indefinitely Postpone (Rep. Wilhelm): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 195-190 05/18/2023 House Journal 14 P. 16 |
2023-05-18 | House | Lay SB272 on Table (Rep. L. Turcotte): Motion Failed Regular Calendar 186-199 05/18/2023 House Journal 14 P. 32 |
2023-05-18 | House | FLAM # 2023-1907h (): Amendment Adopted Regular Calendar 198-187 05/18/2023 House Journal 14 P. 30 |
2023-05-18 | House | FLAM # 2023-1886h (Rep. Hynes): Amendment Adopted Regular Calendar 198-187 05/18/2023 House Journal 14 P. 27 |
2023-05-18 | House | Reconsider Amendment 2023-1675h (Rep. Weber): Motion Failed Regular Calendar 184-201 05/18/2023 House Journal 14 P. 25 |
2023-05-18 | House | FLAM # 2023-1675h (Reps. Merchant, Bordes, Coker, O'Hara): Amendment Adopted Regular Calendar 201-184 05/18/2023 House Journal 14 P. 23 |
2023-05-18 | House | FLAM # 2023-1836h (Rep. Merchant): Amendment Adopted Regular Calendar 198-187 05/18/2023 House Journal 14 P. 21 |
2023-05-18 | House | FLAM # 2023-1819h (): Amendment Adopted Regular Calendar 196-189 05/18/2023 House Journal 14 P. 18 |
2023-05-18 | House | FLAM # 2023-1818h (Rep. Merchant): Amendment Adopted Regular Calendar 196-188 05/18/2023 House Journal 14 P. 16 |
2023-05-02 | House | Committee Report: Without Recommendation 04/25/2023 (Vote ; Regular Calendar) |
2023-04-12 | House | Executive Session: 04/25/2023 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2023-03-28 | House | ==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 03/30/2023 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205-207l |
2023-03-28 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 04/18/2023 10:00 am State House Reps Hall |
2023-03-21 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 03/16/2023 and referred to Education |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Without Objection, Sen. Avard Moved the Question, Motion Adopted; 03/16/2023; Senate Journal 10 |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-1038s, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 03/16/2023; Senate Journal 10 |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Sen. Carson Floor Amendment # 2023-1038s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/16/2023; Senate Journal 10 |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/16/2023; Senate Calendar 13 |
2023-02-23 | Senate | ===ROOM CHANGE=== Hearing: 03/07/2023, Room 100, State House, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 12 |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Introduced 02/14/2023 and Referred to Education; Senate Journal 8 |