NH SB27 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Failed on May 18 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-18 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 276-75; House Journal 44, PG.1552-1555
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Failed on May 18 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-18 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 276-75; House Journal 44, PG.1552-1555
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to speed limitations for boats.
Title
Relative to speed limitations for boats.
Sponsors
Rep. Alfred Baldasaro [R] | Sen. David Boutin [R] | Rep. Guy Comtois [R] | Sen. Lou D'Allesandro [D] |
Sen. John Gallus [R] | Rep. John Hikel [R] | Sen. Andy Sanborn [R] | Rep. Mark Warden [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-05-18 - House - ITL (Y: 276 N: 75 NV: 45 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-23 - Senate - Ought to Pass with Amendment (Y: 13 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-23 - Senate - Ought to Pass with Amendment (Y: 13 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-18 | House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 276-75; House Journal 44, PG.1552-1555 | |
2011-05-03 | House Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass; House Calendar 39, PG.1325 | |
2011-05-03 | House Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for May 18 (Vote 11-6; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 39, PG.1325 | |
2011-04-26 | House Executive Session: 5/3/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 203 | |
2011-04-06 | House Public Hearing: 4/19/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 201-203 | |
2011-03-31 | House Vacated from Resources, Recreation and Development and Referred to Transportation: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 35, PG.1193 | |
2011-03-30 | House ==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 4/6/2011 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 305-307 | |
2011-03-28 | House Introduced and Referred to Resources, Recreation and Development; House Journal 30, PG.1036 | |
2011-03-23 | Senate Passed by Third Reading Resolution; Senate Journal 10, Pg.187 | |
2011-03-23 | Senate Ought to Pass with Amendment 0989s, Regular Calendar 13Y-11N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 10, Pg.186 | |
2011-03-23 | Senate Committee Amendment 0989s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 10, Pg.186 | |
2011-03-17 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2011-0989s, 3/23/11; Senate Calendar 16 | |
2011-02-10 | Senate Hearing: 2/24/11, Room 305-307, Legislative Office Building, 9:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 11 | |
2011-01-19 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Transportation, Senate Journal 3, Pg.32 |