NH SB262 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Enrolled on May 27 2022 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-27 - Enrolled (in recess of) 05/26/2022 House Journal 14
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on May 27 2022 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-27 - Enrolled (in recess of) 05/26/2022 House Journal 14
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to customer generators of electric energy.
Title
Relative to customer generators of electric energy.
Sponsors
Sen. Kevin Avard [R] | Sen. David Watters [D] | Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] | Sen. James Gray [R] |
Sen. Bob Giuda [R] | Rep. Kat McGhee [D] | Sen. Timothy Lang [R] | Sen. Howard Pearl [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-27 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 05/26/2022 House Journal 14 |
2022-05-27 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 05/26/2022); Senate Journal 13 |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Sen. Avard Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/12/2022; Senate Journal 12 |
2022-05-04 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1631h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/04/2022 House Journal 11 |
2022-05-04 | House | Amendment # 1631h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/04/2022 House Journal 11 |
2022-04-22 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-1631h (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) |
2022-04-13 | House | Executive Session: 04/19/2022 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2022-03-30 | House | Public Hearing: 04/05/2022 02:30 pm Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2022-03-28 | House | Introduced 03/28/2022 and referred to Science, Technology and Energy |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendments 2022-1109s and 2022-1148s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/24/2022; Senate Journal 6 |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Sen. Avard Floor Amendment # 2022-1148s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/24/2022; Senate Journal 6 |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2022-1109s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/24/2022; Senate Journal 6 |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-1109s, 03/24/2022; Senate Calendar 12 |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Hearing: 02/22/2022, Room 103, State House, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 8 |
2021-12-14 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/05/2022 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 1 |