NH SB259 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB259
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-03 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 01/03/2024; Senate Journal 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-03 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 01/03/2024; Senate Journal 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to traffic and safety improvements on Route 101 Amherst, Bedford, and Milford.
Title
Relative to traffic and safety improvements on Route 101 Amherst, Bedford, and Milford.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-03 | Senate | Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 01/03/2024; Senate Journal 1 |
2023-12-18 | Senate | Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 01/03/2024; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 49 |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/16/2023; Senate Journal 10 |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Sen. Chandley Moved to Remove SB 259 from the Consent Calendar; 03/16/2023; Senate Journal 10 |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 03/16/2023; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 13 |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Hearing: 01/31/2023, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 01:30 pm; Senate Calendar 8 |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Introduced 01/19/2023 and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 5 |
Same As/Similar To
SB259 (Carry Over) 2023-03-16 - Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/16/2023; Senate Journal 10