NH SB253 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-18 - To Be Inexpedient to Legislate, Senate Rule 3-23, Adjournment 09/25/2019;
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-18 - To Be Inexpedient to Legislate, Senate Rule 3-23, Adjournment 09/25/2019;
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to statewide deployment of a real-time threat notification system for schools.
Title
Relative to statewide deployment of a real-time threat notification system for schools.
Sponsors
Sen. David Watters [D] | Sen. Jay Kahn [D] | Sen. Martha Hennessey [D] | Sen. Melanie Levesque [D] |
Rep. Roderick Ladd [R] | Rep. Glenn Cordelli [R] | Rep. Jess Edwards [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Rereferred (Y: 2 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Rereferred (Y: 2 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-18 | Senate | To Be Inexpedient to Legislate, Senate Rule 3-23, Adjournment 09/25/2019; |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Pending Motion OT3rdg; 03/27/2019; Senate Journal 10 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Sen. D'Allesandro Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/27/2019; Senate Journal 10 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Special Order to the present time, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 03/27/2019; Senate Journal 10 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/27/2019; Senate Journal 10 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/27/2019; Senate Calendar 15 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Regular Calendar 23Y-1N, Motion Adopted; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 03/14/2019; Senate Journal 8 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Sen. Watters Moved Ought to Pass; 03/14/2019; Senate Journal 8 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee, Regular Calendar 2Y-22N, Motion Failed; 03/14/2019; Senate Journal 8 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 03/14/2019; Senate Calendar 13 |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Hearing: 02/19/2019, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 10:30 am; Senate Calendar 10 |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Introduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Education and Workforce Development; Senate Journal 4 |