NH SB25 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-04 - Signed by the Governor on 05/03/2016; Chapter 0039; Effective 07/02/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-04 - Signed by the Governor on 05/03/2016; Chapter 0039; Effective 07/02/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the administration of epinephrine.
Title
Relative to the administration of epinephrine.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-04 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 05/03/2016; Chapter 0039; Effective 07/02/2016 |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 04/21/2016); Senate Journal 15 |
2016-04-26 | House | Enrolled 04/20/2016 House Journal 36 P. 51 |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2016-1436e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 04/14/2016); Senate Journal 14 |
2016-04-19 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2016-1436e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 04/06/2016 House Journal 31 P. 25 |
2016-04-06 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/06/2016 House Journal 31 P. 4 |
2016-03-25 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 04/06/2016 (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 21 P. 7 |
2016-03-15 | House | Executive Session: 03/15/2016 03:00 PM Legislative Office Building 207 |
2016-03-08 | House | Public Hearing: 03/15/2016 02:15 PM Legislative Office Building 207 |
2016-02-16 | House | Introduced 01/28/2016 and referred to Education House Journal 10 P. 10 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2411s, New Title, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 01/06/2016; Senate Journal 1 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | Committee Amendment 2411s, New Title, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 01/06/2016 |
2015-10-14 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-2411s, New Title, 1/6/16; Senate Calendar 49 |
2015-09-01 | Senate | Hearing: 9/22/15, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 10:10 a.m.; Senate Calendar 34 |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote, Senate Journal 8 |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 3/12/15; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 12 |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Hearing: 2/17/15, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 9:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 10 |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Education; Senate Journal 5 |