NH SB249 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-5)
Status: Introduced on December 14 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-11 - Hearing: 01/25/2022, Room 100, State House, 09:30 am; Senate Calendar 3
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Hearing: Jan 25 @ 9:30 am in Room 100, State House
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibiting planning and zoning ordinances that prohibit short-term rentals.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibiting planning and zoning ordinances that prohibit short-term rentals.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-11SenateHearing: 01/25/2022, Room 100, State House, 09:30 am; Senate Calendar 3
2021-12-14SenateTo Be Introduced 01/05/2022 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 1

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback