NH SB244 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-24 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/24/2022; Senate Journal 4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-24 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/24/2022; Senate Journal 4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to non-conforming structures and variances.
Title
Relative to non-conforming structures and variances.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-24 | Senate | Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/24/2022; Senate Journal 4 |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 02/24/2022; Senate Calendar 8 |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Hearing: 01/24/2022, Room 100, State House, 01:15 pm; Senate Calendar 4 |
2021-12-14 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/05/2022 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 1 |