NH SB235 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-03 - Signed by the Governor on 06/29/2017; Chapter 0187; Effective 08/28/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-03 - Signed by the Governor on 06/29/2017; Chapter 0187; Effective 08/28/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Medicaid reimbursement to schools for students with medical needs.
Title
Relative to Medicaid reimbursement to schools for students with medical needs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-09 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-03 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/29/2017; Chapter 0187; Effective 08/28/2017 |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/08/2017); Senate Journal 20 |
2017-06-13 | House | Enrolled 06/08/2017 House Journal 18 P. 9 |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/18/2017; Senate Journal 17 |
2017-05-04 | House | Referral Waived by Committee Chair per House Rule 46(f) 05/04/2017 House Journal 15 P. 39 |
2017-05-04 | House | Referred to Finance 05/04/2017 House Journal 15 P. 7 |
2017-05-04 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1421h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/04/2017 House Journal 15 P. 6 |
2017-05-04 | House | Amendment #2017-1421h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/04/2017 House Journal 15 P. 6 |
2017-04-18 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-1421h for 05/04/2017 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 22 P. 6 |
2017-04-12 | House | Executive Session: 04/18/2017 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 205 |
2017-04-12 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 04/14/2017 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 207 |
2017-04-04 | House | Public Hearing: 04/12/2017 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 205 |
2017-04-04 | House | Introduced 03/23/2017 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 11 P. 28 |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendments 2017-1106s and 2017-1231s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/30/2017; Senate Journal 12 |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Sen. Sanborn Floor Amendment #2017-1231s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/30/2017; Senate Journal 12 |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Floor Amendment #2017-1106s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/30/2017; Senate Journal 12 |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Moved Ought to Pass; 03/30/2017; Senate Journal 12 |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee, Motion Failed, Voice Vote; 03/30/2017; Senate Journal 12 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 03/30/2017; Senate Calendar 16 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Special Order SB 235-FN to 03/30/2017, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 03/29/2017 Senate Journal 11 |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Special Order SB 235-FN to the Next Session, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 03/23/2017; Senate Journal 10 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 03/23/2017; Senate Calendar 15 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 03/09/2017; Senate Journal 8 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Special Order SB 235-FN to after Public and Municipal Affairs, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 03/09/2017; Senate Journal 8 |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/09/2017; Senate Calendar 12 |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Hearing: 02/21/2017, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 01:30 pm; Senate Calendar 11 |
2017-02-08 | Senate | ==CANCELLED== Hearing: 02/13/2017, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:15 am; Senate Calendar 10 |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Introduced 01/19/2017 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 5 |