NH SB234 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-19 - Signed by the Governor on 06/16/2017; Chapter 0117; Effective 06/16/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-19 - Signed by the Governor on 06/16/2017; Chapter 0117; Effective 06/16/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to hypodermic syringes and needles containing residual amounts of controlled drugs and authorizing the operation of syringe service programs in New Hampshire.
Title
Relative to hypodermic syringes and needles containing residual amounts of controlled drugs and authorizing the operation of syringe service programs in New Hampshire.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-16 - Senate - Ought to Pass with Amendment (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-19 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/16/2017; Chapter 0117; Effective 06/16/2017 |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/31/2017); Senate Journal 19 |
2017-06-01 | House | Enrolled 06/01/2017 House Journal 17 P. 127 |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2017-1888e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 05/18/2017); Senate Journal 18 |
2017-05-24 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2017-1888e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/18/2017 House Journal 16 P. 9 |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/11/2017; Senate Journal 16 |
2017-05-04 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1376h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/04/2017 House Journal 15 P. 5 |
2017-05-04 | House | Amendment #2017-1376h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/04/2017 House Journal 15 P. 5 |
2017-04-26 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-1376h for 05/04/2017 (Vote 21-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 22 P. 6 |
2017-04-19 | House | Executive Session: 04/25/2017 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 205 |
2017-04-04 | House | Public Hearing: 04/11/2017 10:15 am Legislative Office Building 205 |
2017-03-29 | House | Introduced 03/23/2017 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 11 P. 26 |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2017-1064s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/23/2017; Senate Journal 10 |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Floor Amendment #2017-1064s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/23/2017; Senate Journal 10 |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/23/2017; Senate Calendar 15 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2017-0789s, Regular Calendar 20Y-2N, Motion Adopted; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 03/16/2017; Senate Journal 9 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Withdraws Floor Amendment #2017-0907s; 03/16/2017; Senate Journal 9 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Offered Floor Amendment #2017-0907s; 03/16/2017; Senate Journal 9 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Committee Amendment #2017-0789s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/16/2017; Senate Journal 9 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Special Order SB 234 to After the Next Recess, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 03/16/2017; Senate Journal 9 |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-0789s, 03/16/2017; Senate Calendar 14 |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Hearing: 02/14/2017, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 02:00 pm; Senate Calendar 10 |
2017-02-02 | Senate | ==CANCELLED== Hearing: 02/09/2017, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 01:00 pm; Senate Calendar 9 |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Introduced 01/19/2017 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 5 |