NH SB231 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-11 - Senate Signed by the Governor on 06/11/2012; Chapter 0178; Effective 08/10/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-11 - Senate Signed by the Governor on 06/11/2012; Chapter 0178; Effective 08/10/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to municipal liens.
Title
Relative to municipal liens.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-11 | Senate Signed by the Governor on 06/11/2012; Chapter 0178; Effective 08/10/2012 | |
2012-06-05 | Senate Enrolled (05/23/12) | |
2012-05-30 | House Enrolled; House Journal 47, PG.2508 | |
2012-05-23 | Senate Sen. Barnes Concurs with House Amendment #1563h; Motion Adopted, Voice Vote | |
2012-05-16 | House Ought to Pass with Amendment #1563h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 44, PG.2391-2392 | |
2012-05-16 | House Amendment #1563h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 44, PG.2391-2392 | |
2012-05-08 | House Proposed Committee Amendment #2012-1563h; House Calendar 37, PG.2078-2079 | |
2012-05-08 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #1563h for May 15 (Vote 16-0; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 37, PG.2046 | |
2012-04-18 | House Executive Session: 5/8/2012 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 | |
2012-03-27 | House Full Committee Work Session: 4/10/2012 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 301 | |
2012-03-27 | House Public Hearing: 4/4/2012 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 | |
2012-03-20 | House ==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 4/3/2012 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 301 | |
2012-03-08 | House Introduced and Referred to Municipal and County Government; House Journal 23, PG.1447 | |
2012-03-07 | Senate Ought to Pass with Amendment 0978s, New Title, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 6, Pg.148 | |
2012-03-07 | Senate Committee Amendment 0978s, New Title, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 6, Pg.148 | |
2012-02-23 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2012-0978s, New Title, 3/7/12; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 9 | |
2012-01-01 | Senate Hearing: 1/17/12, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 9:20 a.m. | |
2012-01-01 | Senate Introduced 1/4/2012 and Referred to Public and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 1, Pg.4 |