NH SB225 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-16 - Signed by the Governor on 06/11/2014; Chapter 0108; Effective 06/11/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-16 - Signed by the Governor on 06/11/2014; Chapter 0108; Effective 06/11/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the city of Manchester employees' contributory retirement system.
Title
Relative to the city of Manchester employees' contributory retirement system.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-16 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/11/2014; Chapter 0108; Effective 06/11/2014 |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Enrolled |
2014-05-15 | House | Enrolled |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Sen. Boutin Concurs with House Amendment #1280h, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote |
2014-04-16 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #1280h Motion Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-04-16 | House | Amendment #2014-1280h Amendment Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-04-10 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-1280h (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 27 |
2014-04-02 | House | Executive Session: 4/8/14 3:00 PM Legislative Office Building 305-307 |
2014-03-26 | House | Public Hearing: 4/2/2014 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 307 |
2014-03-13 | House | Introduced and Referred to Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0108s, Motion Adopted Voice Vote; OT3rdg |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Committee Amendment 0108s, Amendment Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-0108s, 1/30/14; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 4 |
2014-01-09 | Senate | Hearing: 1/15/14, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 10:15 a.m.; Senate Calendar 2 |
2013-12-11 | Senate | Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Public and Municipal Affairs |