NH SB221 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-24 - Retained in Committee
Pending: House Special Committee on Childcare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-24 - Retained in Committee
Pending: House Special Committee on Childcare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a study committee to examine day care access and affordability.
Title
Establishing a study committee to examine day care access and affordability.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-24 | House | Retained in Committee |
2023-05-11 | House | Executive Session: 05/17/2023 10:15 am Legislative Office Building 104 |
2023-05-10 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 05/17/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 104 |
2023-05-04 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 05/10/2023 11:15 am Legislative Office Building 104 |
2023-05-04 | House | Public Hearing: 05/10/2023 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 104 |
2023-04-07 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 04/06/2023 and referred to Special Committee on Childcare |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-1256s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/30/2023; Senate Journal 12 |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Sen. Gray Floor Amendment # 2023-1256s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/30/2023; Senate Journal 12 |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Sen. Gray Moved Ought to Pass; 03/30/2023; Senate Journal 12 |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Failed, Voice Vote; 03/30/2023; Senate Journal 12 |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 03/30/2023; Senate Calendar 15 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | ==TIME CHANGE== Hearing: 03/07/2023, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 09:15 am; Senate Calendar 12 |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Introduced 01/19/2023 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 5 |