NH SB219 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB219
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-03 - Reconsider Inexpedient to Legislate (Rep. Weber): Motion Failed DV 173-177 05/02/2024 House Journal 12 P. 91
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-03 - Reconsider Inexpedient to Legislate (Rep. Weber): Motion Failed DV 173-177 05/02/2024 House Journal 12 P. 91
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring mandatory reporting by school districts of school expenses.
Title
Requiring mandatory reporting by school districts of school expenses.
Sponsors
Sen. Keith Murphy [R] | Sen. Daniel Innis [R] | Rep. Jim Kofalt [R] | Rep. Glenn Cordelli [R] |
Rep. Leah Cushman [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-05-02 - House - ITL (Y: 178 N: 172 NV: 20 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2024-05-02 - House - OTP (Y: 182 N: 184 NV: 9 Abs: 21) [FAIL]
2024-05-02 - House - Reconsider (Y: 185 N: 181 NV: 9 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2024-05-02 - House - OTP (Y: 180 N: 179 NV: 17 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2024-01-03 - Senate - Floor Amendment (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-03 - Senate - Inexpedient to Legislate (Y: 10 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-05-02 - House - OTP (Y: 182 N: 184 NV: 9 Abs: 21) [FAIL]
2024-05-02 - House - Reconsider (Y: 185 N: 181 NV: 9 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2024-05-02 - House - OTP (Y: 180 N: 179 NV: 17 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2024-01-03 - Senate - Floor Amendment (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-03 - Senate - Inexpedient to Legislate (Y: 10 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-03 | House | Reconsider Inexpedient to Legislate (Rep. Weber): Motion Failed DV 173-177 05/02/2024 House Journal 12 P. 91 |
2024-05-03 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 178-172 05/02/2024 House Journal 12 P. 89 |
2024-05-03 | House | Remove from Table (Rep. Simpson): Motion Adopted DV 176-174 05/02/2024 House Journal 12 P. 89 |
2024-05-02 | House | Lay SB219 on Table (Rep. Sweeney): Motion Adopted DV 184-183 05/02/2024 House Journal 12 P. 80 |
2024-05-02 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Failed Regular Calendar 182-184 05/02/2024 House Journal 12 P. 78 |
2024-05-02 | House | Reconsider Ought to Pass (Rep. Read): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 185-181 05/02/2024 House Journal 12 P. 76 |
2024-05-02 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 180-179 05/02/2024 House Journal 12 P. 39 |
2024-04-24 | House | Committee Report: Without Recommendation 04/22/2024 (Vote 10-10; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 17 P. 18 |
2024-04-16 | House | Executive Session: 04/22/2024 12:45 pm Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2024-04-10 | House | Public Hearing: 04/16/2024 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2024-04-02 | House | Introduced 04/02/2024 and referred to Education House Journal 10 P. 227 |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-1262s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/21/2024; Senate Journal 7 |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Sen. Watters Floor Amendment # 2024-0723s, Amendment Failed, Voice Vote; 03/21/2024; Senate Journal 7 |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Sen. Gray Floor Amendment # 2024-1262s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/21/2024; Senate Journal 7 |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2024-0533s, Amendment Failed, Voice Vote; 03/21/2024; Senate Journal 7 |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Special Order to the present time, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 03/21/2024; Senate Journal 7 |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-0533s, 03/21/2024, Vote 4-2; Senate Calendar 11 |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Special Order to 03/21/2024, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 03/07/2024 Senate Journal 6 |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-0533s, 02/15/2024, Vote 4-2; Senate Calendar 8 |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-0533s, 03/07/2024, Vote 4-2; Senate Calendar 9 |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Special Order to 03/07/2024, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 02/21/2024 Senate Journal 5 |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Special Order to the Next Session, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 02/15/2024; Senate Journal 4 |
2024-01-03 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-0030s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 01/03/2024; Senate Journal 1 |
2024-01-03 | Senate | Sen. Murphy Floor Amendment # 2024-0030s, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Amendment Adopted; 01/03/2024; Senate Journal 1 |
2024-01-03 | Senate | Sen. Lang Moved Ought to Pass; 01/03/2024; Senate Journal 1 |
2024-01-03 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 10Y-14N, Motion Failed; 01/03/2024; Senate Journal 1 |
2023-12-18 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 01/03/2024, Vote 4-0; Senate Calendar 49 |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Sen. Carson Moved to Rerefer to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/09/2023; Senate Journal 9 |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Failed, Voice Vote; 03/09/2023; Senate Journal 9 |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Sen. Carson Moved to Remove SB 219 from the Consent Calendar; 03/09/2023; Senate Journal 9 |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; 03/09/2023; Senate Calendar 12 |
2023-02-14 | Senate | ==RECONVENE== Hearing: 02/21/2023, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 11 |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Hearing: ===RECESSED=== 02/14/2023, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:30 am; Senate Calendar 10 |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Introduced 01/19/2023 and Referred to Education; Senate Journal 5 |
Same As/Similar To
SB219 (Carry Over) 2023-03-09 - Sen. Carson Moved to Rerefer to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/09/2023; Senate Journal 9