NH SB199 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 03/14/2019; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 03/14/2019; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring teachers to have training in suicide and bullying awareness and prevention.
Title
Requiring teachers to have training in suicide and bullying awareness and prevention.
Sponsors
Sen. Ruth Ward [R] | Sen. Regina Birdsell [R] | Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] | Sen. Sharon Carson [R] |
Sen. James Gray [R] | Sen. Charles Morse [R] | Rep. Patrick Abrami [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-14 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 03/14/2019; Senate Journal 8 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 03/14/2019; Senate Calendar 13 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Hearing: 03/05/2019, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 09:45 am; Senate Calendar 12 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Introduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Education and Workforce Development; Senate Journal 4 |