NH SB197 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-1839h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/08/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to noncompete agreements for low-wage employees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to noncompete agreements for low-wage employees.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-08HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-1839h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/08/2019
2019-05-08HouseFLAM # 2019-1839h (Rep. Sullivan): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/08/2019
2019-05-08HouseAmendment # 2019-1598h: Amendment Failed Voice Vote 05/08/2019
2019-05-08HouseRemoved from Consent (Rep. Sullivan) 05/08/2019
2019-05-01HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1598h for 05/08/2019 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 23 P. 6
2019-04-24House==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 05/01/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 307
2019-04-10House==RECESSED== Executive Session: 04/17/2019 02:30 pm Legislative Office Building 307
2019-03-27House==TIME CHANGE== Public Hearing: 04/03/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 307
2019-03-21HouseIntroduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services House Journal 11 P. 70
2019-02-21SenateOught to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/21/2019; Senate Journal 6
2019-02-12SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/21/2019; Senate Calendar 11
2019-02-06SenateHearing: 02/12/2019, Room 100, State House, 01:30 pm; Senate Calendar 10
2019-01-22SenateIntroduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback