NH SB189 | 2018 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB189

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 15 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Enrolled 05/10/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring insurance policies to cover 3-D mammography.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requiring insurance policies to cover 3-D mammography.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-03 - Senate - Interim Study (Y: 154 N: 178 NV: 29 Abs: 30) [FAIL]
2018-01-03 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-03 - Senate - Committee Amendment 2553s (Y: 2 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-15HouseEnrolled 05/10/2018
2018-05-15SenateEnrolled (In recess 05/10/2018); Senate Journal 18
2018-05-03HouseReconsider SB 189 (Rep. White): Motion Failed Voice Vote 05/03/2018
2018-05-03HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/03/2018
2018-05-03HouseRefer for Interim Study: Motion Failed Regular Calendar 154-178 05/03/2018
2018-05-02HouseSpecial Order to first order of business on 5/3/2018 (Rep. Hunt): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/02/2018
2018-04-25HouseMinority Committee Report: Ought to Pass
2018-04-25HouseMajority Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study for 05/02/2018 (Vote 11-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 17 P. 10
2018-04-12HouseExecutive Session: 04/17/2018 01:30 PM Legislative Office Building 302
2018-04-04HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 04/11/2018 01:45 PM Legislative Office Building 302
2018-03-28HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 04/04/2018 01:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302
2018-03-20HousePublic Hearing: 03/27/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302
2018-03-12HouseIntroduced 03/07/2018 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 7 P. 50
2018-01-03SenateOught to Pass: Regular Calendar 23Y-0N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 01/03/2018; Senate Journal 1
2018-01-03SenateCommittee Amendment # 2017-2553s, Regular Calendar 2Y-21N, Amendment Failed; 01/03/2018; Senate Journal 1
2017-12-11SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2017-2553s, 01/03/2018; Senate Calendar 48
2017-03-09SenateRereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/09/2017; Senate Journal 8
2017-02-23SenateCommittee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 03/09/2017; Senate Calendar 12
2017-01-31SenateHearing: 02/07/2017, Room 100, State House, 02:00 pm; Senate Calendar 9
2017-01-30SenateIntroduced 01/19/2017 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 5

Same As/Similar To

SB189 (Carry Over) 2017-12-11 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-2553s

New Hampshire State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/bill_status.aspx?lsr=867&sy=2018&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2018&txtbillnumber=SB189
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2018&id=867&txtFormat=html
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2018&v=HP&id=867
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=2&sy=2018&lb=S&eb=SB0189&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2018&txtbillnumber=SB189&ddlsponsors=&lsr=867
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=3&sy=2018&lb=S&eb=SB0189&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2018&txtbillnumber=SB189&ddlsponsors=&lsr=867
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=212&sy=2018&lb=H&eb=SB0189&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2018&txtbillnumber=SB189&ddlsponsors=&lsr=867

Bill Comments

feedback