NH SB188 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-16 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 03/16/2017; Senate Journal 9
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-16 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 03/16/2017; Senate Journal 9
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a nonpartisan revenue estimator position in the department of administrative services.
Title
Establishing a nonpartisan revenue estimator position in the department of administrative services.
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Feltes [D] | Rep. Richard Ames [D] | Rep. David Luneau [D] | Rep. Patricia Lovejoy [D] |
Rep. Dennis Malloy [D] | Rep. Dennis Malloy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-16 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 03/16/2017; Senate Journal 9 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 03/16/2017; Senate Calendar 14 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Special Order SB 188-FN to the Next Session, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 03/09/2017; Senate Journal 8 |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 03/09/2017; Senate Calendar 12 |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Hearing: ===RECONVENE=== 02/15/2017, Room 100, State House, 09:10 am; Senate Calendar 10 |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Hearing: ===RECESSED=== 02/08/2017, Room 100, State House, 09:40 am; Senate Calendar 9 |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Introduced 01/19/2017 and Referred to Ways and Means; Senate Journal 5 |