NH SB184 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-19 - Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote, Senate Journal 9
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-19 - Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote, Senate Journal 9
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Adopting the Uniform Marital Property Act.
Title
Adopting the Uniform Marital Property Act.
Sponsors
Sen. Kevin Avard [R] | Rep. Jeffrey Oligny [R] | Sen. Sam Cataldo [R] | Rep. Carol McGuire [R] |
Sen. Andy Sanborn [R] | Sen. John Reagan [R] | Rep. Dan McGuire [R] | Sen. David Pierce [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-19 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote, Senate Journal 9 |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 3/19/15; Senate Calendar 13 |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Hearing: 3/10/15, Room 100, State House, 9:45 a.m.; Senate Calendar 12 |
2015-01-08 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 4 |