NH SB184 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-03 - Signed by the Governor on 07/02/2013; Chapter 0190; Effective 08/31/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-03 - Signed by the Governor on 07/02/2013; Chapter 0190; Effective 08/31/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Excluding conservation officers of the fish and game department from requirements for emergency medical and trauma services.
Title
Excluding conservation officers of the fish and game department from requirements for emergency medical and trauma services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-03 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 07/02/2013; Chapter 0190; Effective 08/31/2013 |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Enrolled |
2013-06-05 | House | Enrolled; House Journal 49, PG.1654 |
2013-06-05 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 49, PG.1569 |
2013-05-30 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for June 5 (Vote 23-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar42, PG.1428 |
2013-05-15 | House | Executive Session: 5/29/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2013-05-15 | House | Division II Work Session: 5/28/2013 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 209 |
2013-05-08 | House | Referred to Finance; House Journal 41, PG.1389 |
2013-05-08 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 41, PG.1389 |
2013-05-01 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for May 8 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar36, PG.1196 |
2013-04-17 | House | Executive Session: 4/30/2013 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 306 |
2013-04-10 | House | Public Hearing: 4/16/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 |
2013-04-03 | House | Introduced and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; House Journal 35, PG.1192 |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 3/28/13; Senate Calendar 13 |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0774s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; Senate Journal 7 |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Committee Amendment 0774s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 7 |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-0774s, 3/14/13; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 11 |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Hearing: 2/20/13, Room 100, State House, 9:40 a.m.; Senate Calendar 9 |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Executive Dept. & Admin; Senate Journal 5 |