NH SB183 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB183
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-03 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 01/03/2018; Senate Journal 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-03 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 01/03/2018; Senate Journal 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing the New Hampshire technology sector marketing tax credit.
Title
Establishing the New Hampshire technology sector marketing tax credit.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | Senate | Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 01/03/2018; Senate Journal 1 |
2017-12-13 | Senate | Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 01/03/2008; Senate Calendar 48 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/16/2017; Senate Journal 9 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 03/16/2017; Senate Calendar 14 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Special Order SB 183-FN to the Next Session, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 03/09/2017; Senate Journal 8 |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 03/09/2017; Senate Calendar 12 |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Hearing: 02/08/2017, Room 100, State House, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 9 |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Introduced 01/19/2017 and Referred to Ways and Means; Senate Journal 5 |
Same As/Similar To
SB183 (Carry Over) 2017-03-16 - Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/16/2017; Senate Journal 9