NH SB179 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-15 - Signed by the Governor on 07/15/2013; Chapter 0232; Effective 09/13/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-15 - Signed by the Governor on 07/15/2013; Chapter 0232; Effective 09/13/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifying the definition of renewable generation facility for purposes of payments in lieu of property tax payments and allowing certain facilities that combust municipal waste for energy to make payments in lieu of property tax payments.
Title
Clarifying the definition of renewable generation facility for purposes of payments in lieu of property tax payments and allowing certain facilities that combust municipal waste for energy to make payments in lieu of property tax payments.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-15 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 07/15/2013; Chapter 0232; Effective 09/13/2013 |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Enrolled |
2013-06-26 | House | Enrolled; House Journal 52, PG.1711 |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Sen. Odell Moved Concur with House Amendment #1698h, New Title, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote |
2013-05-29 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #1698h(NT): Motion Adopted Division Vote 256-63; House Journal 45, PG.1516-1517 |
2013-05-29 | House | Amendment #1698h(NT): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 45, PG.1516-1517 |
2013-05-15 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; House Calendar40, PG.1372-1373 |
2013-05-15 | House | Proposed Majority Committee Amendment #2013-1698h (New Title); House Calendar40, PG.1383-1384 |
2013-05-15 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #1698h(NT) for May 29 (Vote 14-4; Regular Calendar); House Calendar40, PG.1372-1373 |
2013-05-08 | House | Executive Session: 5/14/2013 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 304 |
2013-04-09 | House | Public Hearing: 4/16/2013 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 303 |
2013-03-27 | House | Introduced and Referred to Science, Technology and Energy; House Journal 31, PG.1076 |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 3/21/13; Senate Calendar 12 |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Hearing: 3/12/13, Room 103, State House, 9:15 a.m.; Senate Calendar 10 |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Ways & Means; Senate Journal 5 |