NH SB173 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-11 - Signed by the Governor on 07/10/2013; Chapter 0216; Effective 09/08/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-11 - Signed by the Governor on 07/10/2013; Chapter 0216; Effective 09/08/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to criminal background checks for individuals volunteering or applying for employment at licensed child care facilities.
Title
Relative to criminal background checks for individuals volunteering or applying for employment at licensed child care facilities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-11 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 07/10/2013; Chapter 0216; Effective 09/08/2013 |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Enrolled (6/12/13) |
2013-06-20 | House | Enrolled [Recess of 6/5/13]; House Journal 49, PG.1654 |
2013-06-05 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 49, PG.1566 |
2013-05-28 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for June 5 (Vote 13-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar42, PG.1427 |
2013-05-14 | House | Executive Session: 5/28/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 |
2013-05-14 | House | Public Hearing: 5/21/2013 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 |
2013-05-08 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety; House Journal 41, PG.1387 |
2013-05-08 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 41, PG.1387 |
2013-04-25 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for May 8 (Vote 15-1; Consent Calendar); House Calendar36, PG.1195 |
2013-04-16 | House | Executive Session: 4/24/2013 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 206 ==Or One Hour After House Session== |
2013-04-09 | House | Public Hearing: 4/16/2013 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 206 |
2013-03-27 | House | Introduced and Referred to Children and Family Law; House Journal 31, PG.1076 |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0851s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Committee Amendment 0851s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-0851s, 3/21/13; Senate Calendar 12 |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Hearing: 3/5/13, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 11:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 10 |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Health, Education & Human Services; Senate Journal 5 |