NH SB172 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB172
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-13 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-13 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to transfers within the judicial branch.
Title
Relative to transfers within the judicial branch.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-13 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) |
2019-10-02 | House | Executive Session: 11/12/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2019-10-02 | House | Division I Work Session: 10/22/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 212 |
2019-05-01 | House | Retained in Committee |
2019-04-24 | House | Executive Session: 05/01/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2019-04-24 | House | Division I Work Session: 04/30/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 212 |
2019-04-08 | House | Public Hearing: 04/24/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2019-03-21 | House | Introduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Finance House Journal 11 P. 70 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/07/2019; Senate Journal 7 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/07/2019; Senate Calendar 12 |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Hearing: 02/12/2019, Room 103, State House, 01:30 pm; Senate Calendar 10 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Introduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Finance; Senate Journal 4 |
Same As/Similar To
SB172 (Carry Over) 2019-11-13 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar)