NH SB171 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/14/2019; Senate Journal 8
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Appropriating money to remove lead from drinking water pipes in schools.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appropriating money to remove lead from drinking water pipes in schools.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-14SenateRereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/14/2019; Senate Journal 8
2019-03-05SenateCommittee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 03/14/2019; Senate Calendar 13
2019-02-06SenateHearing: 02/12/2019, Room 103, State House, 01:15 pm; Senate Calendar 10
2019-01-22SenateIntroduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Finance; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback