NH SB170 | 2018 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB170

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-04 - Signed by the Governor on 05/30/2018; Chapter 0118; Effective 05/30/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the authority of towns to issue bonds for the expansion of broadband infrastructure.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the authority of towns to issue bonds for the expansion of broadband infrastructure.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-04SenateSigned by the Governor on 05/30/2018; Chapter 0118; Effective 05/30/2018
2018-05-09HouseEnrolled 05/03/2018
2018-05-09SenateEnrolled (In recess 05/03/2018); Senate Journal 17
2018-05-01SenateEnrolled Bill Amendment # 2018-1808e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 04/26/2018); Senate Journal 15
2018-05-01HouseEnrolled Bill Amendment # 2018-1808e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 04/26/2018
2018-04-19HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/19/2018 House Journal 13 P. 8
2018-04-11HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass for 04/19/2018 (Vote 16-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 15 P. 7
2018-04-11HouseExecutive Session: 04/11/2018 Legislative Office Building 301
2018-03-14HousePublic Hearing: 03/27/2018 02:15 PM Legislative Office Building 301
2018-03-12HouseIntroduced 03/07/2018 and referred to Municipal and County Government House Journal 7 P. 50
2018-01-03SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2017-2497s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 01/03/2018; Senate Journal 1
2018-01-03SenateCommittee Amendment # 2017-2497s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 01/03/2018; Senate Journal 1
2017-11-21SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2017-2497s, 01/03/2018; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 48
2017-03-09SenateSen. Gray Moved to Rerefer, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/09/2017; Senate Journal 8
2017-03-09SenateInexpedient to Legislate, Motion Failed, Voice Vote; 03/09/2017; Senate Journal 8
2017-02-22SenateCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 03/09/2017; Senate Calendar 12
2017-02-01SenateHearing: 02/08/2017, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 9
2017-01-24SenateIntroduced 01/19/2017 and Referred to Public and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 5

Same As/Similar To

SB170 (Carry Over) 2017-11-21 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-2497s; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback