NH SB170 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB170
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-21 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-2497s; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-21 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-2497s; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the authority of towns to issue bonds for the expansion of broadband infrastructure.
Title
Relative to the authority of towns to issue bonds for the expansion of broadband infrastructure.
Sponsors
Sen. Jay Kahn [D] | Rep. John Bordenet [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-21 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-2497s; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Sen. Gray Moved to Rerefer, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/09/2017; Senate Journal 8 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Failed, Voice Vote; 03/09/2017; Senate Journal 8 |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 03/09/2017; Senate Calendar 12 |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Hearing: 02/08/2017, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 9 |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Introduced 01/19/2017 and Referred to Public and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 5 |
Same As/Similar To
SB170 (Carry Over) 2017-11-21 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-2497s; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar