NH SB165 | 2018 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB165

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Signed by the Governor on 05/25/2018; Chapter 0096; Effective 07/24/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizing periodic payments as security after a motor vehicle accident.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizing periodic payments as security after a motor vehicle accident.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-31SenateSigned by the Governor on 05/25/2018; Chapter 0096; Effective 07/24/2018
2018-05-01SenateEnrolled (In recess 04/26/2018); Senate Journal 15
2018-05-01HouseEnrolled 04/26/2018
2018-04-19HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/19/2018 House Journal 13 P. 12
2018-04-11HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass for 04/19/2018 (Vote 15-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 15 P. 10
2018-04-11HouseExecutive Session: 04/10/2018 Legislative Office Building 203
2018-03-21HousePublic Hearing: 04/03/2018 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 203
2018-03-12HouseIntroduced 03/07/2018 and referred to Transportation House Journal 7 P. 50
2018-01-03SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2017-2546s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 01/03/2018; Senate Journal 1
2018-01-03SenateCommittee Amendment # 2017-2546s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 01/03/2018; Senate Journal 1
2017-12-13SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2017-2546s, 01/03/2018; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 48
2017-02-17SenateRereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/16/2017; Senate Journal 6
2017-02-09SenateCommittee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 02/16/2017; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 10
2017-02-01SenateHearing: 02/07/2017, Room 100, State House, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 9
2017-01-24SenateIntroduced 01/19/2017 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 5

Same As/Similar To

SB165 (Carry Over) 2017-02-17 - Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/16/2017; Senate Journal 6

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback