NH SB165 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB165
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-17 - Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/16/2017; Senate Journal 6
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-17 - Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/16/2017; Senate Journal 6
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing periodic payments as security after a motor vehicle accident.
Title
Authorizing periodic payments as security after a motor vehicle accident.
Sponsors
Sen. Donna Soucy [D] | Rep. Rebecca Mcbeath [D] | Sen. Dan Feltes [D] | Rep. Steven Smith [R] |
Sen. Regina Birdsell [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-17 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/16/2017; Senate Journal 6 |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 02/16/2017; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 10 |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Hearing: 02/07/2017, Room 100, State House, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 9 |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Introduced 01/19/2017 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 5 |
Same As/Similar To
SB165 (Carry Over) 2017-02-17 - Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/16/2017; Senate Journal 6