NH SB162 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB162
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-13 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-13 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Exempting commercial vessels from rafting rules.
Title
Exempting commercial vessels from rafting rules.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-13 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) |
2019-10-02 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 10/15/2019 11:15 am Legislative Office Building 305 |
2019-10-02 | House | Executive Session: 10/30/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 305 |
2019-05-21 | House | Retained in Committee |
2019-04-16 | House | Executive Session: 04/30/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 305 |
2019-04-16 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 04/30/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 305 |
2019-04-03 | House | Public Hearing: 04/10/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 305 |
2019-04-01 | House | Introduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Resources, Recreation and Development House Journal 11 P. 73 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-1163s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/28/2019; Senate Journal 11 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2019-1163s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/28/2019; Senate Journal 11 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1163s, 03/28/2019; Senate Calendar 15 |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Hearing: 02/12/2019, Room 103, State House, 09:30 am; Senate Calendar 10 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Introduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 4 |
Same As/Similar To
SB162 (Carry Over) 2019-11-13 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar)