NH SB160 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB160
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-11 - Rereferred to Committee, Regular Calendar 23Y-1N, Motion Adopted; 03/11/2021; Senate Journal 7
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-11 - Rereferred to Committee, Regular Calendar 23Y-1N, Motion Adopted; 03/11/2021; Senate Journal 7
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to multiple employer welfare arrangements.
Title
Relative to multiple employer welfare arrangements.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-11 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee, Regular Calendar 23Y-1N, Motion Adopted; 03/11/2021; Senate Journal 7 |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 03/11/2021; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 14 |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Remote Hearing: 03/02/2021, 09:30 am; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 12 |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Introduced 02/04/2021 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 4 |
Same As/Similar To
SB160 (Carry Over) 2021-03-11 - Rereferred to Committee, Regular Calendar 23Y-1N, Motion Adopted; 03/11/2021; Senate Journal 7