NH SB160 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB160
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-04 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/04/2022 House Journal 11
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-04 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/04/2022 House Journal 11
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to multiple employer welfare arrangements.
Title
Relative to multiple employer welfare arrangements.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-04 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/04/2022 House Journal 11 |
2022-04-22 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) |
2022-04-13 | House | Executive Session: 04/20/2022 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2022-04-05 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 04/14/2022 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2022-03-30 | House | Public Hearing: 04/07/2022 01:15 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2022-03-23 | House | Introduced 03/17/2022 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs |
2022-01-05 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2021-2240s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 01/05/2022; Senate Journal 1 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2021-2240s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 01/05/2022; Senate Journal 1 |
2021-12-16 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-2240s, 01/05/2022; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 49 |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee, Regular Calendar 23Y-1N, Motion Adopted; 03/11/2021; Senate Journal 7 |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 03/11/2021; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 14 |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Remote Hearing: 03/02/2021, 09:30 am; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 12 |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Introduced 02/04/2021 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 4 |
Same As/Similar To
SB160 (Carry Over) 2021-03-11 - Rereferred to Committee, Regular Calendar 23Y-1N, Motion Adopted; 03/11/2021; Senate Journal 7