NH SB157 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-01 - Pending Motion OT3rdg; 04/01/2021; Senate Journal 10
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to funding of children's mental health services and making an appropriation to fund positions in the department of health and human services contracts and procurement unit.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to funding of children's mental health services and making an appropriation to fund positions in the department of health and human services contracts and procurement unit.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-01 - Senate - Laid on Table (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Committee Amendment 0451s (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Committee Amendment 0451s (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-01SenatePending Motion OT3rdg; 04/01/2021; Senate Journal 10
2021-04-01SenateSen. Bradley Moved Laid on Table, Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted; 04/01/2021; Senate Journal 10
2021-04-01SenateOught to Pass: Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted; 04/01/2021; Senate Journal 10
2021-03-24SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/01/2021; Senate Calendar 17
2021-03-04SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2021-0451s, Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 03/04/2021; Senate Journal 6
2021-03-04SenateCommittee Amendment # 2021-0451s, Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Amendment Adopted; 03/04/2021; Senate Journal 6
2021-02-19SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-0451s, 03/04/2021; Senate Calendar 12
2021-02-10SenateRemote Hearing: 02/17/2021, 09:00 am; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 11
2021-02-09SenateIntroduced 02/04/2021 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/bill_status.aspx?lsr=914&sy=2021&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=SB157
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2021&id=905&txtFormat=html
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2021&txtFormat=html&v=SA&id=905
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=93&sy=2021&lb=S&eb=SB0157&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=SB157&ddlsponsors=&lsr=914
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=94&sy=2021&lb=S&eb=SB0157&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=SB157&ddlsponsors=&lsr=914
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=93&sy=2021&lb=S&eb=SB0157&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=SB157&ddlsponsors=&lsr=0914
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=94&sy=2021&lb=S&eb=SB0157&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=SB157&ddlsponsors=&lsr=0914
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=265&sy=2021&lb=S&eb=SB0157&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=SB157&ddlsponsors=&lsr=914
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=266&sy=2021&lb=S&eb=SB0157&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=SB157&ddlsponsors=&lsr=914

Bill Comments 750

feedback