NH SB157 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB157
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 01/08/2020; Senate Journal 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 01/08/2020; Senate Journal 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Making undeclared voters eligible to be inspectors.
Title
Making undeclared voters eligible to be inspectors.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 01/08/2020; Senate Journal 1 |
2019-12-06 | Senate | Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 01/08/2020; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 47 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Sen. Feltes Moved to Rerefer to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/28/2019; Senate Journal 11 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2019-1191s, Regular Calendar 10Y-14N, Amendment Failed; 03/28/2019; Senate Journal 11 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Special Order to be taken up in committee order, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 03/28/2019; Senate Journal 11 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1191s, 03/28/2019; Senate Journal 10 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Sen. Levesque Moved to Remove SB 157 from the Consent Calendar; 03/27/2019; Senate Journal 10 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1191s, 03/27/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 15 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Hearing: 03/06/2019, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 10:00 am; Senate Calendar 12 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Introduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 4 |
Same As/Similar To
SB157 (Carry Over) 2019-12-06 - Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar