NH SB157 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Sen. Feltes Moved to Rerefer to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/28/2019; Senate Journal 11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Making undeclared voters eligible to be inspectors.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Making undeclared voters eligible to be inspectors.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-28 - Senate - Committee Amendment 1191s (Y: 10 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-28SenateSen. Feltes Moved to Rerefer to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/28/2019; Senate Journal 11
2019-03-28SenateCommittee Amendment # 2019-1191s, Regular Calendar 10Y-14N, Amendment Failed; 03/28/2019; Senate Journal 11
2019-03-28SenateSpecial Order to be taken up in committee order, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 03/28/2019; Senate Journal 11
2019-03-27SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1191s, 03/28/2019; Senate Journal 10
2019-03-27SenateSen. Levesque Moved to Remove SB 157 from the Consent Calendar; 03/27/2019; Senate Journal 10
2019-03-20SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1191s, 03/27/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 15
2019-02-21SenateHearing: 03/06/2019, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 10:00 am; Senate Calendar 12
2019-01-22SenateIntroduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback