NH SB155 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-13 - II. Remainder Effective 07/09/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Codifying provisions included in select emergency orders issued by the governor in response to the COVID-19 pandemic.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Codifying provisions included in select emergency orders issued by the governor in response to the COVID-19 pandemic.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-03 - House - Adopt Amendment (Y: 182 N: 193 NV: 23 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Committee Amendment (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-13SenateII. Remainder Effective 07/09/2021
2021-07-13SenateI. Section 10 Effective 01/31/2022
2021-07-13SenateSigned by the Governor on 07/09/2021; Chapter 0121
2021-07-01HouseEnrolled (in recess of) 06/24/2021
2021-07-01SenateEnrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 06/24/2021); Senate Journal 20
2021-06-29SenateEnrolled Bill Amendment # 2021-2049e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 06/24/2021); Senate Journal 20
2021-06-25HouseEnrolled Bill Amendment # 2021-2049e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote (in recess of) 06/24/2021
2021-06-24SenateConference Committee Report # 2021-1994c, Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/24/2021; Senate Journal 20
2021-06-24HouseConference Committee Report 2021-1994c: Adopted, Voice Vote 06/24/2021
2021-06-17HouseConference Committee Report # 2021-1994c Filed 06/10/2021; House Amendment + New Amendment
2021-06-14Senate==RECONVENE== Committee of Conference Meeting: 06/15/2021, 02:00 pm, Room 100, State House
2021-06-14Senate==RECESSED== Committee of Conference Meeting: 06/14/2021, 01:00 pm, Room 100, State House
2021-06-11SenateConferee Change; Senator Prentiss Replaces Senator Cavanaugh; Senate Journal 20
2021-06-10HouseSpeaker Appoints: Reps. Roy, Bailey, T. Lekas, Schuett 06/10/2021 House Journal 10 P. 16
2021-06-10HouseHouse Accedes to Senate Request for CofC (Rep. McGuire): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/10/2021 House Journal 10 P. 16
2021-06-10SenatePresident Appoints: Senators Carson, Bradley, Cavanaugh; 06/10/2021; Senate Journal 19
2021-06-10SenateSen. Carson Moved Nonconcur with the House Amendment; Requests C of C, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/10/2021; Senate Journal 19
2021-06-03HouseReconsider (Rep. Goley): Motion Failed DV 117-258 06/03/2021 House Journal 8 P. 154
2021-06-03HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2021-1646h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/03/2021 House Journal 8 P. 153
2021-06-03HouseAmendment # 2021-1646h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/03/2021 House Journal 8 P. 151
2021-06-03HouseFLAM # 2021-1864h (Rep. Roy): Amendment Failed Regular Calendar 182-193 06/03/2021 House Journal 8 P. 142
2021-05-27HouseCommittee Report: Without Recommendation (Vote ; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 26 P. 22
2021-05-13HousePublic Hearing on non-germane Amendment # 2021-1443h: 05/18/2021 01:30 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://zoom.us/j/97887037548 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened.
2021-05-12HouseExecutive Session: 05/25/2021 11:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://zoom.us/j/91900709064
2021-05-12HouseNon germane amendment #2021-1149h Subcommittee Work Session: 05/13/2021 09:30 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://zoom.us/j/95614649564
2021-05-04HouseNon-germane amendment #2021-1149h Subcommittee Work Session: 05/11/2021 10:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://zoom.us/j/92150579267
2021-04-21HousePublic Hearing on non-germane Amendment # 2021-1149h: 04/27/2021 01:05 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://zoom.us/j/93185691814 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened.
2021-04-21HousePublic Hearing: 04/27/2021 01:00 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://zoom.us/j/93185691814 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened.
2021-03-31HouseIntroduced (in recess of) 02/25/2021 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 4 P. 50
2021-03-18SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2021-0774s, Regular Calendar 23Y-1N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 03/18/2021; Senate Journal 8
2021-03-18SenateCommittee Amendment # 2021-0774s, Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Amendment Adopted; 03/18/2021; Senate Journal 8
2021-03-10SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-0774s, 03/18/2021; Senate Calendar 15
2021-02-11SenateRemote Hearing: 02/17/2021, 10:30 am; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 11
2021-02-09SenateIntroduced 02/04/2021 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/bill_status.aspx?lsr=1080&sy=2021&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=SB155
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2021&id=1077&txtFormat=html
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2021&txtFormat=html&v=SA&id=1077
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2021&txtFormat=html&v=HA&id=1077
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=181&sy=2021&lb=S&eb=SB0155&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=SB155&ddlsponsors=&lsr=1080
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=182&sy=2021&lb=S&eb=SB0155&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=SB155&ddlsponsors=&lsr=1080
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=165&sy=2021&lb=H&eb=SB0155&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=SB155&ddlsponsors=&lsr=1080

Bill Comments

feedback