NH SB155 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on June 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-22 - II. Remainder Effective 08/20/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on June 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-22 - II. Remainder Effective 08/20/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing the Financial Resources Mortgage (FRM) victims' contribution recovery fund for victims of the FRM fraud and continually appropriating a special fund.
Title
Establishing the Financial Resources Mortgage (FRM) victims' contribution recovery fund for victims of the FRM fraud and continually appropriating a special fund.
Sponsors
Sen. Kevin Avard [R] | Rep. J.R. Hoell [R] | Rep. John Burt [R] | Rep. Kenneth Gidge [D] |
Sen. John Reagan [R] | Sen. Lou D'Allesandro [D] | Sen. Andy Sanborn [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-22 | Senate | II. Remainder Effective 08/20/2016 |
2016-06-22 | Senate | I. Sections 4-6 Effective 07/01/2023 |
2016-06-22 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/21/2016; Chapter 0293 |
2016-06-15 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/01/2016); Senate Journal 20 |
2016-06-15 | House | Enrolled 06/01/2016 House Journal 42 P. 66 |
2016-06-10 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2016-2144e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 06/01/2016); Senate Journal 20 |
2016-06-09 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2016-2144e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/01/2016 House Journal 42 P. 62 |
2016-06-01 | Senate | Conference Committee Report 1999c, Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/01/2016 Senate Journal 19 |
2016-06-01 | House | Conference Committee Report 1999c: Adopted, Voice Vote 06/01/2016 House Journal 42 P. 10 |
2016-05-24 | House | Conference Committee Report #2016-1999c Filed 05/24/2016; As Amended by the House |
2016-05-23 | Senate | Conferee Change; Senator Carson Replaces Senator Woodburn Senate Journal 19 |
2016-05-19 | Senate | ==RECONVENE== Committee of Conference Meeting: 05/23/2016, 08:30 am, Room 103, State House |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Committee of Conference Meeting: 05/19/2016, 02:30 pm, Room 103, State House==RECESSED== |
2016-05-11 | House | Speaker Appoints: Reps. Hunt, Gidge, Hurt, Weyler 05/11/2015 House Journal 38 P. 5 |
2016-05-11 | House | House Accedes to Senate Request for CofC (Reps. Hunt, Kurk): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/11/2016 House Journal 38 P. 5 |
2016-04-14 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Reagan, Woodburn, Avard; (In Recess 04/14/2016); Senate Journal 14 |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Sen. Carson Moved Nonconcur with House Amendment # 0440h; Requests C of C, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/31/2016; Senate Journal 11 |
2016-03-09 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0440h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2016 House Journal 23 P. 30 |
2016-03-09 | House | Amendment #2016-0440h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2016 House Journal 23 P. 30 |
2016-03-09 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2016-0440h (NT) for 03/09/2016 (Vote 23-2; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 19 |
2016-02-19 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Executive Session: 03/02/2016 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2016-02-19 | House | ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 03/03/2016 09:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 210 |
2016-02-08 | House | ==CANCELLED== Division I Work Session: 02/16/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 212 |
2016-02-03 | House | Division I Work Session: 02/08/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 212 |
2016-01-20 | House | Division I Work Session: 02/02/2016 10:45 Amendment Legislative Office Building 212 |
2016-01-06 | House | Referred to Finance 01/06/2016 House Journal 4 P. 75 |
2016-01-06 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2504h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/06/2016 House Journal 4 P. 72 |
2016-01-06 | House | Amendment #2015-2504h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 01/06/2016 House Journal 4 P. 72 |
2015-11-12 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-2504h (NT) for Jan 6 (Vote 16-3; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 67, PG. 14-15 |
2015-10-14 | House | Executive Session: 10/27/2015 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2015-10-13 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/20/2015 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 |
2015-09-29 | House | Retained Bill - Full Committee Work Session: 10/13/2015 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 |
2015-09-15 | House | Retained Bill - Full Committee Work Session: 9/29/2015 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 |
2015-09-01 | House | Retained Bill - Full Committee Work Session: 9/15/2015 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 |
2015-08-24 | House | Retained Bill - Full Committee Work Session: 9/1/2015 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 |
2015-06-12 | House | Retained Bill - Full Committee Work Session: 6/23/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 |
2015-06-02 | House | Retained Bill - Full Committee Work Session: 6/9/2015 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2015-06-02 | House | Retained Bill - Full Committee Work Session: 6/9/2015 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2015-06-02 | House | Retained Bill - Full Committee Work Session: 6/9/2015 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2015-04-28 | House | Retained in Committee |
2015-04-14 | House | ===CANCELLED=== Work Session: 4/21/2015 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 |
2015-04-01 | House | Executive Session: 4/28/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 |
2015-04-01 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 4/21/2015 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 |
2015-03-25 | House | Public Hearing: 3/31/2015 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 |
2015-03-24 | House | Introduced and Referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs (in recess of 3/12/2015); House Journal 26, PG. 1276 |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0805s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 9 |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Committee Amendment 0805s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-0805s, 3/19/15; Senate Calendar 13 |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; Senate Journal 7 |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 3/5/15; Senate Calendar 11 |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Hearing: 2/18/15, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 9:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 10 |
2015-01-08 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 4 |