NH SB154 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-06-24 - Lay on Table (Rep. Steven Smith): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 354-19 06/24/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibiting the state from enforcing any federal statute, regulation, or Presidential Executive Order that restricts or regulates the right of the people to keep and bear arms.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibiting the state from enforcing any federal statute, regulation, or Presidential Executive Order that restricts or regulates the right of the people to keep and bear arms.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-24 - House - Table (Y: 354 N: 19 NV: 8 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Senate - Nonconcur and Request a C of C (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - House - OTPA (Y: 199 N: 177 NV: 22 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - House - Table (Y: 174 N: 203 NV: 21 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-03 - House - Adopt Amendment (Y: 200 N: 176 NV: 22 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Committee Amendment 0987s (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-24HouseLay on Table (Rep. Steven Smith): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 354-19 06/24/2021
2021-06-17HouseConference Committee Report # 2021-2034c Filed 06/10/2021; House Amendment + New Amendment
2021-06-17SenateConferee Change; Senator Daniels Replaces Senator Prentiss; Senate Journal 20
2021-06-11SenateCommittee of Conference Meeting: 06/16/2021, 8:15 a.m., Room Senate Chamber, State House
2021-06-10HouseSpeaker Appoints: Reps. Abbas, Lynn, Osborne, Wallace 06/10/2021 House Journal 10 P. 15
2021-06-10HouseHouse Accedes to Senate Request for CofC (Rep. Abbas): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/10/2021 House Journal 10 P. 15
2021-06-10SenatePresident Appoints: Senators Bradley, Carson, Prentiss; 06/10/2021; Senate Journal 19
2021-06-10SenateSen. Carson Moved Nonconcur with the House Amendment; Requests C of C, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted; 06/10/2021; Senate Journal 19
2021-06-03HouseAmendment # 2021-1220h: Amendment Adopted Regular Calendar 200-176 06/03/2021 House Journal 8 P. 108
2021-06-03HouseReconsider (Rep. Baldasaro): Motion Failed DV 169-209 06/03/2021 House Journal 8 P. 114
2021-06-03HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2021-1220h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 199-177 06/03/2021 House Journal 8 P. 112
2021-06-03HouseLay on Table (Rep. Cushing): Motion Failed Regular Calendar 174-203 06/03/2021 House Journal 8 P. 110
2021-05-17HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2021-05-17HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-1220h (Vote 11-10; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 26 P. 18
2021-05-10HouseExecutive Session: 05/10/2021 09:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/97305033264
2021-04-21HousePublic Hearing: 04/28/2021 11:30 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/97143779905 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened.
2021-04-13HouseIntroduced (in recess of) 04/09/2021 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 7 P. 100
2021-04-01SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2021-0987s, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 04/01/2021; Senate Journal 10
2021-04-01SenateCommittee Amendment # 2021-0987s, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Amendment Adopted; 04/01/2021; Senate Journal 10
2021-03-24SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-0987s, 04/01/2021; Senate Calendar 17
2021-03-10SenateRemote Hearing: 03/16/2021, 02:00 pm; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 15
2021-02-09SenateIntroduced 02/04/2021 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/bill_status.aspx?lsr=1079&sy=2021&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=SB154
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2021&id=1076&txtFormat=html
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2021&txtFormat=html&v=SA&id=1076
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2021&txtFormat=html&v=HA&id=1076
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=273&sy=2021&lb=S&eb=SB0154&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=SB154&ddlsponsors=&lsr=1079
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=274&sy=2021&lb=S&eb=SB0154&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=SB154&ddlsponsors=&lsr=1079
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=157&sy=2021&lb=H&eb=SB0154&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=SB154&ddlsponsors=&lsr=1079
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=158&sy=2021&lb=H&eb=SB0154&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=SB154&ddlsponsors=&lsr=1079
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=159&sy=2021&lb=H&eb=SB0154&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=SB154&ddlsponsors=&lsr=1079
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=433&sy=2021&lb=S&eb=SB0154&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=SB154&ddlsponsors=&lsr=1079
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=189&sy=2021&lb=H&eb=SB0154&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=SB154&ddlsponsors=&lsr=1079

Bill Comments

feedback